Multiplication With 11 In 5 Seconds

Multiplication With 11 In 5 Seconds
Multiplication With 11 In 5 Seconds

Multiplication With 11 can be time-consuming sometimes. You must have thought that there much be some way that can simplify this or just reduce the time consumed in multiplication by 11. Vedic mathematics have the solution for this problem.

Let’s start to know this method of mental multiplication with 11.

Take an example : say we have to multiply 63 * 11 = 6 (sum of 6 and 3) 3 = 693

Can you see what actually happened in the above example. If you are multiplying any number by 11 simply write the first and last digit (in this case 6 and 3) as it is by giving an imaginary space between them and in that space write the sum of them (6+3=9). By practising few examples you can start understanding how many spaces comes between the first and last number in any said problem of multiplication with 11.

a) 36 * 11 = 3 (3+6)6 = 396
b) 81 * 11 = 8 (8+1) 1 = 891
c) 71 * 11 = 7 (7+1) 1 = 781 

Example: 621 * 11 = 6831
Write 6 and 1 as it is by giving some space between them 6 _ _ 1, looking from the unit place for this example the space b/w 6 and 1 have to be filled with sum of 1+2 and 2+6 i.e the solution is 6 8 3 1

Now one this you must have to understand that from the above two examples the sum of numbers b/w the first and last number are coming less that 10 . Let’s take some example in which sum of numbers will be more that 9.

Can you find out Cube Root of a 6 digit number in 5 seconds

Example : 73 * 11 = (7+1) 0  3

Write 7 and 3 as it is by giving some space between them 7 _ 3, looking from the unit place for this example the space b/w 7 and 3 have to be filled with sum of 3+7 (i.e 10)  so write 0 (zero) in the space b/w 7 and 3 and 1 will be carry over to 7 and it will add up with 7 (7+1=8) and the answer will be 803

For more clarity take another example: 678*11 = (6+1)  4 5 8

Write 6 and 8 as it is by giving some space between them 6 _ _ 8, looking from the unit place for this example the space b/w 6  and 8 have to be filled with sum of 8+7 (i.e 15)  so write 5  in the first space (from left) b/w 6 and 8 and 1 will be carry over to 7 and it will add up with 7 (7+1=8) now for the second space 8 will be added to 6 (look 7 has become 8 due to carry over 1 ), 8+6 = 14 , 4 will be placed in the second space and 1 will be carry over to 6 and it will become 7 Hence the answer is 7458

Multiplication with 11
Multiplication with 11 in 5 seconds

Whether you are a student, aspiring engineer, statistician, scientist, school instructor or any other person managing numbers, learning this snappy mental traps and systems will help you. Figuring out how to perform quick mental maths computation will help you massively independent of which field of life you bargain with.Knowing these mental maths traps will give you a positive edge over the others.

To know ALL ABOUT IBPS

Be the first to comment

Leave a Reply